AZ SB1198 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public library operation; thirdparty contracts
Title
Public library operation; thirdparty contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Sen. Barbara McGuire [D] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] |
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 337 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-0-9-0) |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House CMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House CMA Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to House CMA Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |