AZ SB1223 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; veterans
Title
In-state tuition; veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Sen. John Nelson [R] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |