AZ SB1234 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy board; virtual manufacturers
Title
Pharmacy board; virtual manufacturers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1234 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Kolodin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1234. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1234 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Kolodin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1234. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 234 |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-06-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2024-06-15 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1234 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. |
2024-04-17 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Kolodin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1234. Passed by vv. |
2024-04-03 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-04-03 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-0-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-1-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Contracting Requirements
Definitions
Oversight Requirements
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Virtual Manufacturers
Contracting Requirements
Definitions
Oversight Requirements
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Virtual Manufacturers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1980 | New Code | See Bill Text |