AZ SB1239 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tribal nations; veterans' services; appropriation
Title
Tribal nations; veterans' services; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |