AZ SB1239 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Off-highway vehicle recreation fund; reports
Title
Off-highway vehicle recreation fund; reports
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Definitions
Off-highway Vehicle Recreation Fund
Off-highway Vehicles
Report
Transportation - Title 28
Definitions
Off-highway Vehicle Recreation Fund
Off-highway Vehicles
Report
Transportation - Title 28