AZ SB1248 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property taxes; valuation; property modifications
Title
Property taxes; valuation; property modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 306 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-9-4-0) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0) |
2019-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |