AZ SB1257 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Long-term recreational vehicle parks; caregivers
Title
Long-term recreational vehicle parks; caregivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 16 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Caregivers
Long-term Recreational
Long-term Recreational Vehicle Parks (h)
Property - Title 33
Recreational Vehicle Long-term Rental Space Act
Rules
Vehicle Parks
Long-term Recreational
Long-term Recreational Vehicle Parks (h)
Property - Title 33
Recreational Vehicle Long-term Rental Space Act
Rules
Vehicle Parks