AZ SB1257 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Water resources; assistant director
Title
Water resources; assistant director
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-04-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2023-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adwr (see Also: Department Of Water Resources)
Applications
Approval
Assignment To Judge
Assistant Director
Branch Offices
Commencing Construction
Consultants
Department
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Deputy Director
Employees
General Adjudications
Legal Counsel
Organization
Personnel Funding
Petition
Representation
Superior Court
Water Resources
Waters - Title 45
Applications
Approval
Assignment To Judge
Assistant Director
Branch Offices
Commencing Construction
Consultants
Department
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Deputy Director
Employees
General Adjudications
Legal Counsel
Organization
Personnel Funding
Petition
Representation
Superior Court
Water Resources
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 1207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |