AZ SB1263 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; administrative tasks; reduction
Title
Schools; administrative tasks; reduction
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Scott Bundgaard [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] |
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (23-7-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (48-11-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-14 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2011-03-14 | House read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-1-0-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |