AZ SB1273 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric bicycles
Title
Electric bicycles
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 819 | New Code | See Bill Text |