AZ SB1279 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public property; erections; satanic; prohibition
Title
Public property; erections; satanic; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-2-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Displays On Public Property
Prohibition
Public Property
Respect Act
Satanic Displays
State Government - Title 41
Counties - Title 11
Displays On Public Property
Prohibition
Public Property
Respect Act
Satanic Displays
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 269.29 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 710.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 500.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |