AZ SB1282 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (10-19-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (10-19-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Registered nonprofit medical marijuana dispensaries
Title
Registered nonprofit medical marijuana dispensaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (10-19-1-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading None voting: (41-17-2-0) |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Medical Marijuana Act
Article Iv
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Dhs
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registered Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispenseries
Rfeir
Strike Everything Amendment
Article Iv
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Dhs
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registered Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispenseries
Rfeir
Strike Everything Amendment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 403.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |