AZ SB1286 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; cities; permits; time limit
Title
Counties; cities; permits; time limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (17-8-5-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |