AZ SB1286 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting centers; polling places
Title
Elections; voting centers; polling places
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Hoffman [R] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] | Rep. Joseph Chaplik [R] | Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] |
Rep. Jacqueline Parker [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appointment Of Election Boards
Conduct Of Elections
Designation Of Election Precincts
Designation Of Polling Places
Education - Title 15
Election Days (h)
Electioneering
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Holidays
Polling Places
Qualifications
Voting Centers
Wait Times
Conduct Of Elections
Designation Of Election Precincts
Designation Of Polling Places
Education - Title 15
Election Days (h)
Electioneering
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Holidays
Polling Places
Qualifications
Voting Centers
Wait Times
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |