AZ SB1291 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; state preemption; penalties
Title
Firearms; state preemption; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-2-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-1-2-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |