AZ SB1296 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency management; relief; rules exemption
Title
Emergency management; relief; rules exemption
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) | |
2012-03-22 | House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM | |
2012-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-01 | House read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |