AZ SB1325 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Independent living program; stipend
Title
Independent living program; stipend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-1-4-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |