AZ SB1326 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Telecommunications; broadband; accelerated depreciation
Title
Telecommunications; broadband; accelerated depreciation
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 220 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-4-6-0) |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-04-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |