AZ SB1338 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pacific conflict; committee; audits
Title
Pacific conflict; committee; audits
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Rep. Selina Bliss [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Michele Pena [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Attestation Of Acts Of Governor
Audits
Bipartisan Select Committee
Committee
Confidentiality
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Effective Date
Pacific Conflict
Pacific Conflict Stress Test Act
Powers And Duties
Public Safety
Reporting Requirements
Salary
State Government - Title 41
Attestation Of Acts Of Governor
Audits
Bipartisan Select Committee
Committee
Confidentiality
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Effective Date
Pacific Conflict
Pacific Conflict Stress Test Act
Powers And Duties
Public Safety
Reporting Requirements
Salary
State Government - Title 41