AZ SB1356 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Business entities; shareholders; officers; directors
Title
Business entities; shareholders; officers; directors
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Rep. Douglas Coleman [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 354 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-13-5-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House BFS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |