AZ SB1413 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction; uniformed services
Title
Income tax; subtraction; uniformed services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Effective Date
Income Tax
Subtraction
Subtractions From Arizona Gross Income
Taxation Of Income
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Uniformed Services
Income Tax
Subtraction
Subtractions From Arizona Gross Income
Taxation Of Income
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Uniformed Services