AZ SB1435 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Modular data center; TPT exemptions
Title
Modular data center; TPT exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |