AZ SB1440 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mining and mineral museum; transfer
Title
Mining and mineral museum; transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House EENR Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-2-4-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |