AZ SB1455 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parental opt-out; statewide assessments
Title
Parental opt-out; statewide assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |