AZ SB1535 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Store display shelf pricing
Title
Store display shelf pricing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (44-15-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |