AZ SB1538 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adult protective services
Title
Adult protective services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 321 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adult Protective Services
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Welfare - Title 46
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Welfare - Title 46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 484 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1959 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 460 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 461 | New Code | See Bill Text |