AZ SB1566 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State bar; attorney charges; damages
Title
State bar; attorney charges; damages
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 226 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-11-3-0) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-04-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Attorney Charges
Attorney Discipline Investigations
Attorney Fees
Court Costs
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Damages
Recovery Of Costs
State Bar Of Arizona
Attorney Discipline Investigations
Attorney Fees
Court Costs
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Damages
Recovery Of Costs
State Bar Of Arizona