AZ SB1566 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School districts; teachers; contract renewal
Title
School districts; teachers; contract renewal
Sponsors
Sen. Flavio Bravo [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Ken Bennett [R] | Sen. Eva Burch [D] |
Sen. Christine Marsh [D] | Rep. Analise Ortiz [D] | Rep. Jennifer Pawlik [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Acceptance
Continuing Teacher
Contract Renewal
Definition
Education - Title 15
Intention Not To Reemploy
Notice To Teacher
Offer Of Contract
Probationary Teacher
School Districts
School Employees
Teachers
Continuing Teacher
Contract Renewal
Definition
Education - Title 15
Intention Not To Reemploy
Notice To Teacher
Offer Of Contract
Probationary Teacher
School Districts
School Employees
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 538.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |