AZ SB1681 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Slow driving; left lane; penalty
Title
Slow driving; left lane; penalty
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Michael Carbone [R] |
Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] | Rep. Teresa Martinez [R] |
Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Driving
Driving On Right Side Of Roadway
Driving On Shoulder
Education
Exceptions
Left Lane
Penalty
Slow Driving
Transportation - Title 28
Driving
Driving On Right Side Of Roadway
Driving On Shoulder
Education
Exceptions
Left Lane
Penalty
Slow Driving
Transportation - Title 28