CA SCR80 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Childhood Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Childhood Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Roth. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Roth. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SCR80 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SCR80#99INT |