AZ SB1691 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2908
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2020-2021.
Title
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2020-2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 57 |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2908 (Replaces) 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Adot
Appropriations
Budget Bills
Capital Outlay
Department Of State And State Institutions
Department Of Transportation
Doc
State Department Of Corrections
Appropriations
Budget Bills
Capital Outlay
Department Of State And State Institutions
Department Of Transportation
Doc
State Department Of Corrections