AZ SB1727 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2817
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; 2023-2024.
Title
Higher education; 2023-2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 140 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-0-0) |
2023-05-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Replaces) 2023-05-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
2023-2024
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Area Health Education System
Arizona Veterinary Loan Assistance Fund
Budget Bills
Community College Districts
Definition
Delayed Repeal
Eligibility
Financial Aid Trust Fund
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Higher Education
Investment Earnings
Limits
Operating State Aid
Primary Care Residency Programs
Reduction
Reporting Requirements
Required State Match
Retroactivity
Rules
Science, Technology, Engineering And Mathematics (stem)
Spouses And Dependents Of Law Enforcement Officers Tuition Scholarship Fund
Spouses Of Military Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund
State Aid
Stem (see Also: Science, Technology, Engineering And Mathematics)
Tuition Scholarship Fund
Tuition Scholarships
Workforce Programs
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Area Health Education System
Arizona Veterinary Loan Assistance Fund
Budget Bills
Community College Districts
Definition
Delayed Repeal
Eligibility
Financial Aid Trust Fund
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Higher Education
Investment Earnings
Limits
Operating State Aid
Primary Care Residency Programs
Reduction
Reporting Requirements
Required State Match
Retroactivity
Rules
Science, Technology, Engineering And Mathematics (stem)
Spouses And Dependents Of Law Enforcement Officers Tuition Scholarship Fund
Spouses Of Military Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund
State Aid
Stem (see Also: Science, Technology, Engineering And Mathematics)
Tuition Scholarship Fund
Tuition Scholarships
Workforce Programs