AZ SCR1001 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Initiatives; single subject; title
Title
Initiatives; single subject; title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Prefile |