AZ SCR1021 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public funds; political candidates; ban
Title
Public funds; political candidates; ban
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House read second time | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |