CA AB1038 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-12 - Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gray.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-12 - Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gray.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 590) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to milk products.
Title
Milk products: California Dairy Future Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB1038 Gray By Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1038 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1038 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gray. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2407.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2416.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2384.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 2. Page 1744.) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 1553.) |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17). |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2159.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 590 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 61901.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |