CA AB104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2022 (Chapters, 43, 45, 249 of the Statutes of 2022) by amending Sections 19.56 and 39.10 of that act, and to amend the Budget Act of 2023 (Chapters 12 and 38 of the Statutes of 2023) by amending Items 0250-101-0001, 0250-101-0932, 0509-102-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-492, 0650-001-0001, 0650-001-3228, 0650-101-0001, 0690-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0690-103-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0845-001-0217, 1700-001-0001, 2240-102-0890, 2240-126-0001, 3100-001-0001, 3125-491, 3360-101-3228, 3480-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3600-001-0001, 3600-101-0001, 3790-001-0001, 3790-101-0001, 3790-301-3312, 3790-490, 3790-492, 3850-101-0001, 3860-001-0001, 3900-001-3228, 3900-490, 3940-001-0001, 3940-001-0193, 3940-001-0306, 3940-001-3058, 4140-001-3397, 4140-101-0001, 4140-101-3397, 4260-019-0001, 4260-115-0890, 4300-001-0001, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-161-0001, 5227-116-0001, 5227-122-0001, 5227-494, 6100-005-0001, 6100-134-0890, 6100-156-0001, 6100-196-0001, 6360-001-0407, 6440-001-0001, 6870-002-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0588, 7120-103-0001, 7502-001-0001, 7502-001-0890, 7870-490, 8140-002-0001, 8260-101-0001, 8260-101-0890, 8570-102-0001, 8940-001-0001, 8940-001-0890, and 9210-115-0001 of Section 2.00 of, adding Items 0250-490, 0509-493, 1111-002-0761, 1111-012-0001, 2240-495, 2245-111-0001, 2740-004-0001, 3100-001-0890, 3355-490, 3790-003-0001, 3790-005-0001, 3790-102-0001, 3860-103-0001, 3900-495, 4140-490, 4140-495, 6440-491, and 8140-101-0001 to Section 2.00 of, amending Sections 19.561, 19.562, 19.563, 19.564, 19.565, 19.566, 19.567, 19.568, 19.569, 35.50, and 39.00 of, and adding Section 39.10 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Acts of 2022 and 2023.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 104 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 104 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2023-08-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 830.) |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.) |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |