CA AB1053 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1766.2 to, to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1400) of Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1300) of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1053 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1053 Solorio By Hancock (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1053 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1053 Solorio By Hancock (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1053 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-12 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 3393.) | |
2009-09-11 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3326.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 11). | |
2009-09-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-10 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2382.) | |
2009-09-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-16 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 7). | |
2009-06-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1877.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |