CA AB1053 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to local government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District: return of improperly collected money.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1053 COOLEY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1053 Cooley Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1053 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1053 Cooley Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1053 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4992.). |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4873.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3362.). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1478.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1764.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |