CA AB1071 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 231.7 to the Education Code, relating to pupil safety.
Title
Teen dating violence prevention education: online information and resources.
Sponsors
Asm. Josh Hoover [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1071 Hoover (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1071 Hoover Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1071 Hoover Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1828.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1523.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 231.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |