CA AB1091 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 100060 and 100060.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority: board of directors.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Berman. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 100060 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 100060.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |