CA AB1130 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2241, 2241.5, and 4301 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 11153, 11156, 11158.1, 11215, 11217, 11217.5, 11218, 11219, 11380.7, and 11847 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorder.
Title
Substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1130 Berman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1130 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1130 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1490.). |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1461.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2241.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11158.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11217.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11380.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |