CA AB1141 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38750 of the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Autonomous vehicles: freight vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38760 | New Code | See Bill Text |