CA AB1142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 82542 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: costs for using facilities or grounds.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1142 Mike Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1142 Mike Fong By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1142 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1142 Mike Fong By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1142 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3931.) |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 82542 | Amended Code | Citation Text |