CA AB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65072.2 and 65080 of, and to add Section 65080.7 to, the Government Code, to add Section 75212.5 to the Public Resources Code, and to add and repeal Section 2386 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation planning.
Title
Regional transportation plan: Active Transportation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1147 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1147 Friedman et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1147 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1147 Friedman et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1147 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2744.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2310.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1684.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65072.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65080.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 75212.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2386 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |