CA AB1147 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4571, 4622, 4626.5, 4642, 4646, 4646.5, and 4726 of, and to add Sections 4629.1 and 4639.76 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Disability Equity and Accountability Act of 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1147 Addis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1147 Addis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Menjivar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-07-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2021.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4626.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4629.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4639.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4646 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4646.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |