CA AB1165 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6600 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Occupational safety and health: violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1165 Skinner By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1165 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1165 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1165 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1165 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3239.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2330.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 1470.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 8). |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6600.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |