CA AB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9848, 20825.1, 22871.3, 22879, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 20683.75, 20683.8, 20683.81, 20683.81.1, 20683.81.2, 20683.82, 20683.83, 20683.9, 20683.91, 20825.15, and 22874.9 to, the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment: State Bargaining Units 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 11, 13, 14, 15, 17, 20, and 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 118 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB118 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 118 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB118 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 118 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3468.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3466.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2902.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1186.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9849 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9850 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.81.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.81.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20825.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20825.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22871.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22874.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |