CA AB1194 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.99.31, 1798.145, and 1798.185 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
California Privacy Rights Act of 2020: exemptions: abortion services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1194 Wendy Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Wendy Carrillo et al By Menjivar (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1194 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Wendy Carrillo et al By Menjivar (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1194 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 3410.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2647.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 1696.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 10). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |