CA AB1196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 981.5 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans' benefits: Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Died at Desk. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 981.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1196&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1196_bill_20130222_introduced.html |