CA AB1196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30700 of the Public Resources Code, relating to ports.
Title
California Coastal Act of 1976: Port of Newport Beach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-12 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-12-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1196 HARPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1196 HARPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1127.) |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 15144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53508.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |